Global patent index - EP 0889702 B1

EP 0889702 B1 2000-09-06 - CLEANSING METHOD AND DEVICE BY MICRONISING WATER UNDER WACUUM

Title (en)

CLEANSING METHOD AND DEVICE BY MICRONISING WATER UNDER WACUUM

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR ENTKEIMUNG MITTELS UNTERDRUCKWASSER-MIKRONISIERUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE MISE EN HYGIENE PAR MICRONISATION D'EAU SOUS VIDE

Publication

EP 0889702 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97906236 A

Priority

  • FR 9700319 W
  • FR 9602312 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9730623A1] A cleansing device operating by suction in a wet medium and comprising a clean water storage tank (1) and a dirty water storage tank (2) combined with a means for wetting the surface or object to be cleansed, a pressurising unit substantially consisting of a pump (10), temperature raising means (14, 15), a temperature control and adjustment means (20), and a suction means (8) for drawing dirty water through an air duct (7) with a downstream end communicating with the second tank (2) in which a vacuum is generated by means of a set of turbines (8). The control and adjustment means are controlled by a computing means to ensure consistent and continuous operation thereof. Said device comprises a means for moistening the surface of the object to be cleansed by means of a fine fog generated by at least one micronising spout (11) arranged adjacent to said surface for micronising water from the first tank (1). Said micronising spout (11) is built into a terminal device (46) at the end of the suction air duct (7).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 11/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 11/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 11/4044 (2013.01); A47L 11/34 (2013.01); A47L 11/4061 (2013.01); A47L 11/4088 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9730623 A1 19970828; AU 2099297 A 19970910; CA 2247518 A1 19970828; DE 69703037 D1 20001012; EP 0889702 A1 19990113; EP 0889702 B1 20000906; FR 2744935 A1 19970822

INPADOC legal status

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-11-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20071030

2006-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060227

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-09-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2001-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: GRANGER-MOLLARD JACQUES

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: PICON ARLETTE

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-08-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-03-07 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20000906

2001-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-20 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010220

2001-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2000-12-07 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001207

2000-12-06 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-12-06 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-12-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-10-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69703037

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-10-12

2000-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-09-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-09-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-09-06 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000906

1999-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990421

1999-06-09 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: CLEANSING METHOD AND DEVICE BY MICRONISING WATER UNDER WACUUM

1999-01-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980918

1999-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU MC NL PT SE