Global Patent Index - EP 0889725 A4

EP 0889725 A4 2000-01-19 - METHOD FOR TREATING BIPOLAR DISORDER

Title (en)

METHOD FOR TREATING BIPOLAR DISORDER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON BIPOLAREN STÖRUNGEN

Title (fr)

METHODE DE TRAITEMENT DES TROUBLES BIPOLAIRES

Publication

EP 0889725 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96944772 A

Priority

  • US 9619575 W
  • US 1315996 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9733577A1] The invention provides a method for treating bipolar disorder comprising administering an effective amount of olanzapine to a patient in need thereof. Additionally, the present invention provides a method for treating Bipolar Disorder, Major Depressive Episode.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/38; A61K 31/55

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 495/04 (2006.01); A61K 31/38 (2006.01); A61K 31/55 (2006.01); A61K 31/551 (2006.01); A61K 31/5513 (2006.01); A61P 25/24 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

A61K (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/551 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] S L MCELROY ET AL: "Mania, Psychosis and Antipsychotics", J CLIN PSYCHIATRY, vol. 57 (SUPPL 3), 1996, pages 14 - 26, XP002122473
  • [X] R W BAKER ET AL: "Olanzapine's impact on depressive and obsessive compulsive symptoms in schizophrenia", PSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY BULLETIN, vol. 31, no. 3, 1995, pages 549, XP002122084
  • [X] T SUPPES ET AL: "Clozapine in the treatment of dysphoric mania", BIOLOGICAL PSYCHIATRY, vol. 32, no. 3, 1 August 1992 (1992-08-01), pages 270 - 280, XP002122085
  • [X] C A ZARATE ET AL: "Clozapine in severe mood disorders", THE JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PSYCHIATRY, vol. 56, no. 9, September 1995 (1995-09-01), pages 411 - 417, XP002122086
  • [X] B K PURI ET AL: "Low-dose maintenance clozapine treatment in the prophylaxis of bipolar affective disorder", BRITISH JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PRACTICE, vol. 49, no. 6, 1995, pages 333 - 334, XP002122087
  • [X] D C FUCHS: "Clozapine treatment of bipolar disorder in a young adolescent", CHILD & ADOLESCENT PSYCHIATRY, vol. 33, no. 9, 1994, pages 1299 - 1302, XP002122088
  • See also references of WO 9733577A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9733577 A1 19970918; AU 1330797 A 19971001; AU 734011 B2 20010531; BR 9612548 A 19990720; CN 1213966 A 19990414; CZ 9802902 A3 19991013; EA 000758 B1 20000424; EP 0889725 A1 19990113; EP 0889725 A4 20000119; HU 9903679 A2 20000428; HU 9903679 A3 20011029; IL 126162 D0 19990509; JP 2000506859 A 20000606; NO 984189 A 19980911; NO 984189 D0 19980911; NZ 326031 A 20010525; PL 328925 A1 19990301; TR 9801797 T2 19981221

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020927

2000-12-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001025

2000-01-19 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19991203

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1999-01-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980911

1999-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1999-01-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 980911;LT PAYMENT 980911;LV PAYMENT 980911;SI PAYMENT 980911