Global Patent Index - EP 0889782 B1

EP 0889782 B1 2000-04-26 - PROCESS FOR PRINTING A CARRIER MATERIAL

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR PRINTING A CARRIER MATERIAL

Title (de)

DRUCKVERFAHREN ZUM BEDRUCKEN EINES TRÄGERMATERIALS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR IMPRIMER UN MATERIAU SUPPORT

Publication

EP 0889782 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97918020 A

Priority

  • DE 9700508 W
  • DE 19612761 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9736746A1] The invention concerns a printing process in which water-repellent and hydrophilic regions are produced on a surface of a print carrier (12) according to the structure of the image to be printed. The surface is then subjected to the action of steam by means of a vapour-deposition device (14), a thin film of moisture forming on the hydrophilic regions. After vapour-deposition, the surface is coloured in a dyeing station (72), the colour adhering to the regions not wetted with water. After colouring, the colour is printed onto the carrier material (60).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 7/24; B41F 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/02 (2006.01); B41F 7/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9736746 A1 19971009; EP 0889782 A1 19990113; EP 0889782 B1 20000426; JP 2000507512 A 20000620; US 6125755 A 20001003

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-01-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59701516

- Effective date: 20121002

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110530

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090313

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090313

2010-02-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090313

2009-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *OCE PRINTING SYSTEMS G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20090331

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080328

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080328

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080423

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080331

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-07-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701516 20000531

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990917

1999-01-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981023

1999-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT