Global Patent Index - EP 0889783 B1

EP 0889783 B1 2000-07-12 - SILK-SCREEN PRINTING MACHINE

Title (en)

SILK-SCREEN PRINTING MACHINE

Title (de)

SIEBDRUCKMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MACHINE D'IMPRESSION EN SERIGRAPHIE

Publication

EP 0889783 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97906079 A

Priority

  • CH 9700115 W
  • CH 73296 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9734767A1] A machine including a printing cylinder (6) engaging two stencil cylinders (7, 18) for printing at least two non-overlapping areas in different colours using the one printing cylinder. One of the stencil cylinders (7) is conventional and enables silk-screen printing in a first area. The other stencil cylinder (18) includes raised portions provided with a stencil for printing one or more further areas different from the first area while preventing the rest of the stencil cylinder (18) from contacting the printing cylinder and particularly the area(s) printed by the first cylinder (7).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 15/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 15/08 (2006.01); B41F 15/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 15/0809 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9734767 A1 19970925; AT 194548 T 20000715; AU 2090297 A 19971010; AU 709046 B2 19990819; CN 1216500 A 19990512; CN 1273293 C 20060906; DE 69702504 D1 20000817; DE 69702504 T2 20010419; EP 0889783 A1 19990113; EP 0889783 B1 20000712; JP 2000506461 A 20000530; JP 4260885 B2 20090430; KR 100453836 B1 20041230; KR 20000064726 A 20001106; RU 2160671 C2 20001220; US 6109172 A 20000829

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-12 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170318

2017-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-03-19 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69702504

2017-03-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69702504

- Representative's name: REBLE KLOSE SCHMITT PARTNERSCHAFTSGESELLSCHAFT, DE

2017-02-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160319

2016-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160320

2016-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 194548 T

- Effective date: 20160319

2016-11-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160204

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160111

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160122

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160205

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-04 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150318

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-05-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150323

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: KBA-NOTASYS SA, CH

- Effective date: 20141223

2012-06-15 [REG AT HC] CHANGE OF THE FIRM NAME OR FIRM ADDRESS

- Owner name: KBA-NOTASYS SA, CH

- Document: AT 194548 T

- Effective date: 20120419

2012-02-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KBA-NOTASYS SA, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DE LA RUE GIORI S.A., LAUSANNE, CH

- Document: DE 69702504

- Effective date: 20111222

2012-02-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69702504

- Representative's name: REBLE & KLOSE RECHTS- UND PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20111222

2012-02-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69702504

- Representative's name: REBLE KLOSE SCHMITT PARTNERSCHAFTSGESELLSCHAFT, DE

- Effective date: 20111222

2011-01-14 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: KBA-NOTASYS SA

- Free text: KBA-GIORI S.A.#AVENUE DU GREY 55 CASE POSTALE 347#1000 LAUSANNE 22 (CH) -TRANSFER TO- KBA-NOTASYS SA#AVENUE DU GREY 55 CASE POSTALE 347#1000 LAUSANNE 22 (CH)

2010-04-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BA-GIORI S.A.

- Free text: KBA-GIORI S.A.#4, RUE DE LA PAIX#1003 LAUSANNE (CH) -TRANSFER TO- KBA-GIORI S.A.#AVENUE DU GREY 55 CASE POSTALE 347#1000 LAUSANNE 22 (CH)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-10-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69702504 20000817

2000-07-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-07-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194548 T 20000715

1999-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990325

1999-01-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980918

1999-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE