Global Patent Index - EP 0889843 B1

EP 0889843 B1 2000-06-14 - THREAD FEED

Title (en)

THREAD FEED

Title (de)

FADENLIEFERGERAT

Title (fr)

APPAREIL D'ALIMENTATION EN FIL

Publication

EP 0889843 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97916387 A

Priority

  • DE 19612720 A
  • EP 9701522 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19612720A1] In a thread feed (F) with a stationary storage drum (T) having at least one cylindrical closed circumferential section (8) and a stationary annular thread control member (S) surrounding the circumferential section (8), the thread control member (S) is a finite strip (B) of uniform cross section, the facing and adjacent ends (16, 17) of which are laid on the circumferential section (8), where the strip (B) is circumferentially rigid and flexible in the radial direction of the storage drum (T) and an elastic tensioner applies the strip under elastic pre-stress at least force-fittingly to the circumferential section (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 51/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/22 (2006.01); B65H 51/22 (2006.01); D03D 47/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/364 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19612720 A1 19971002; CN 1084284 C 20020508; CN 1215378 A 19990428; EP 0889843 A1 19990113; EP 0889843 B1 20000614; KR 20000005002 A 20000125; US 6213419 B1 20010410; WO 9736817 A1 19971009

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070325

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *IRO A.B.

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2002-12-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020429

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-04-04 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020404

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20010326

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-11-10 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-09-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000914

2000-08-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701884 20000720

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IT NL SE

2000-06-14 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000614

1999-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990517

1999-01-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980903

1999-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IT NL SE