Global Patent Index - EP 0889886 B1

EP 0889886 B1 2002-09-18 - NOVEL PHENANTHRIDINES SUBSTITUTED IN THE 6 POSITION

Title (en)

NOVEL PHENANTHRIDINES SUBSTITUTED IN THE 6 POSITION

Title (de)

NEUE IN 6-POSITION SUBSTITUIERTE PHENANTHRIDINE

Title (fr)

NOUVELLES PHENANTHRIDINES SUBSTITUEES EN POSITION 6

Publication

EP 0889886 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97915422 A

Priority

  • EP 97915422 A
  • DE 19611922 A
  • DE 19613091 A
  • EP 9701487 W
  • EP 96105038 A
  • EP 96105311 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9735854A1] Compounds of formula (I) in which R1, R2, R3, R31, R4, R5, R51 and R6 have the meanings given in the description, are novel effective bronchial therapeutic agents.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 401/04; A61K 31/435; C07D 221/12; C07D 491/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/435 (2006.01); A61K 31/47 (2006.01); A61K 31/473 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 11/00 (2006.01); A61P 13/00 (2006.01); A61P 17/00 (2006.01); A61P 19/00 (2006.01); A61P 19/02 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/08 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 221/12 (2006.01); C07D 401/04 (2006.01); C07D 491/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 401/04 (2013.01); C07D 221/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9735854 A1 19971002; AT 224386 T 20021015; AU 2291097 A 19971017; AU 718752 B2 20000420; CA 2250569 A1 19971002; CA 2250569 C 20050510; CY 2431 B1 20041112; DK 0889886 T3 20030120; DK 0889886 T5 20030224; EP 0889886 A1 19990113; EP 0889886 B1 20020918; ES 2184077 T3 20030401; JP 2000507256 A 20000613; JP 4141501 B2 20080827; PT 889886 E 20030228; SI 0889886 T1 20030228

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160325

2018-05-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180507

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160324

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150324

2016-01-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151130

2015-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150324

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59708265

2015-07-24 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: TAKEDA GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20150623

2015-07-24 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: TAKEDA GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20150623

2015-06-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: TAKEDA GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: TAKEDA GMBH, 78467 KONSTANZ, DE

- Document: DE 59708265

2015-05-20 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20150423 AND 20150430

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150225

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150212

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-04-28 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: TAKEDA GMBH

- Effective date: 20150422

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140417

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140319

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140311

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-07-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: TAKEDA GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: NYCOMED GMBH, 78467 KONSTANZ, DE

- Document: DE 59708265

- Effective date: 20130527

2013-05-17 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: TAKEDA GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20130415

2013-05-09 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: TAKEDA GMBH

- Effective date: 20130425

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090325

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090324

2010-06-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091002

2010-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2010-02-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2010-02-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2010-01-29 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20091211

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2010-01-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090324

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2010-01-06 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2009-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-11-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-11-09 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2009-10-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090324

2009-10-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090324

2009-10-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-10-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090924

2009-10-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-10-26 [LTLA] LT: LAPSE OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20090324

2009-10-02 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20090924

2009-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ALTANA PHARMA A.G.

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-04-15 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090319 AND 20090325

2009-03-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2009-03-27 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2009-02-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080903

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-02-27 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20080215

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: NYCOMED GMBH

- Free text: ALTANA PHARMA AG#BYK-GULDEN-STR. 2#78467 KONSTANZ (DE) -TRANSFER TO- NYCOMED GMBH#BYK-GULDEN-STRASSE 2#78467 KONSTANZ (DE)

2008-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080313

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20080314

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20080313

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20080328

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20080228

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080303

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20080306

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080306

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ALTANA PHARMA AG

- Free text: ALTANA PHARMA AG#BYK-GULDEN-STR. 2#78467 KONSTANZ (DE) -TRANSFER TO- ALTANA PHARMA AG#BYK-GULDEN-STR. 2#78467 KONSTANZ (DE)

2008-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080313

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20080314

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-11-04 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1017688

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-04-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2184077 T3

2003-02-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20021216

2003-02-24 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2003-02-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030115

2003-01-20 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-12-19 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020404058

2002-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ALTANA PHARMA AG (SWITZERLAND)

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708265 20021024

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19981026;LT PAYMENT 19981026;LV PAYMENT 19981026;RO PAYMENT 19981026;SI PAYMENT 19981026

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224386 T 20021015

2002-09-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALTANA PHARMA AG

2002-05-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: AMSCHLER, HERMANN

2002-05-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FLOCKERZI, DIETER

2002-05-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ULRICH, WOLF-RUEDIGER

2002-05-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BAER, THOMAS

2002-05-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MARTIN, THOMAS

2002-05-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHUDT, CHRISTIAN

2002-05-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HATZELMANN, ARMIN

2002-05-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BEUME, ROLF

2000-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000911

1999-01-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981026

1999-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-01-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 981026;LT PAYMENT 981026;LV PAYMENT 981026;RO PAYMENT 981026;SI PAYMENT 981026