Global patent index - EP 0889975 B1

EP 0889975 B1 2000-06-07 - DEPOSITION METHOD AND USE OF A PRECURSOR THEREFOR

Title (en)

DEPOSITION METHOD AND USE OF A PRECURSOR THEREFOR

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ABSCHEIDUNG UND VERWENDUNG EINES VORPRODUKTS HIERFÜR

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE DEPOT ET UTILISATION D'UN PRECURSEUR A CELA

Publication

EP 0889975 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96905965 A

Priority

IB 9600262 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9737057A1] The invention relates to use of a molecule with at least one metal atom and a porphyrine-derived ligand as precursor material for decomposition. It further relates to a non-thermal decomposition method with a decomposition means.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 16/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 16/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 16/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9737057 A1 19971009; DE 69608821 D1 20000713; DE 69608821 T2 20001207; EP 0889975 A1 19990113; EP 0889975 B1 20000607

INPADOC legal status

2016-03-29 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69608821

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150323

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-11-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050329

2005-03-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050329

2004-03-01 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040301

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-03 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-07-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69608821

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-13

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-07 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000607

1999-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990201

1999-01-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980923

1999-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB