Global Patent Index - EP 0889977 B1

EP 0889977 B1 2000-08-23 - ZINC PHOSPHATIZING WITH LOW QUANTITY OF COPPER AND MANGANESE

Title (en)

ZINC PHOSPHATIZING WITH LOW QUANTITY OF COPPER AND MANGANESE

Title (de)

ZINKPHOSPHATIERUNG MIT GERINGEN GEHALTEN AN KUPFER UND MANGAN

Title (fr)

PHOSPHATATION DU ZINC AVEC FAIBLE QUANTITE DE CUIVRE ET DE MANGANESE

Publication

EP 0889977 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97902356 A

Priority

  • DE 19606017 A
  • EP 9700603 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19606017A1] Process for phosphatizing metal surfaces of steel, zinc coated or zinc-alloy coated steel and/or of aluminium where the metal surfaces are brought into contact with a phosphatizing solution containing zinc through spraying or immersion for a time between 3 seconds and 8 minutes; the solution contains 0.2 to 3 g/l zinc ions, 3 to 50 g/l phosphate ions, calculated as PO4, 1 to 150 mg/l manganese ions, 1 to 30 mg/l copper ions and one or several accelerators.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 22/18; C23C 22/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 22/18 (2006.01); C23C 22/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 22/83 (2013.01); C23C 22/186 (2013.01); C23C 22/364 (2013.01); C23C 22/365 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19606017 A1 19970821; AR 005908 A1 19990721; AT 195769 T 20000915; AU 1602397 A 19970902; AU 708141 B2 19990729; BR 9707563 A 19990727; CA 2247141 A1 19970821; CN 1064415 C 20010411; CN 1211289 A 19990317; CZ 9802624 A3 19990113; EP 0889977 A1 19990113; EP 0889977 B1 20000823; ES 2149570 T3 20001101; HU 9901001 A2 19990728; HU 9901001 A3 20000428; ID 15964 A 19970821; MX 9806348 A 19981031; PL 327291 A1 19981207; PT 889977 E 20010131; SK 112598 A3 19990111; TR 199801606 T2 19981123; WO 9730190 A1 19970821; ZA 9701375 B 19970819

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050210

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030211

2003-11-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-09-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-09-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030902

2003-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030211

2003-02-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030211

2003-02-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030210

2003-02-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030210

2002-04-18 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020418

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-02-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020227

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-02-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020213

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-02-13 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020213

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-02-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020213

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-02-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020212

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-02-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020206

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-02-05 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20020205

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20001017

2000-12-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001123

2000-11-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2149570 T3

2000-09-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702240 20000928

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

2000-08-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195769 T 20000915

1999-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990212

1999-01-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980808

1999-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT PT SE