Global patent index - EP 0889986 B1

EP 0889986 B1 2000-11-02 - DRYING METHOD AND ASSOCIATED APPARATUS IN A PLANT FOR CHECKING AND STRETCHING KNITTED ARTICLES

Title (en)

DRYING METHOD AND ASSOCIATED APPARATUS IN A PLANT FOR CHECKING AND STRETCHING KNITTED ARTICLES

Title (de)

TROCKNUNGSVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG IN EINER ANLAGE ZUM PRÜFEN UND SPANNEN VON STRICKWAREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE SECHAGE ET APPAREIL ASSOCIE DANS UNE INSTALLATION DE CONTROLE ET D'ETIRAGE D'ARTICLES TRICOTES

Publication

EP 0889986 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97908488 A

Priority

  • IT 9700059 W
  • IT FI960056 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9735059A1] The method comprises several stages involving stoppage of the article in as many chambers (5) as there are stages, in which chambers a vacuum and, optionally, a limited amount of heating are produced. The plant comprises a carousel rotor with several forms (1) each designed to receive an article and each of which is moved in succession through several stations comprising drying stations (C, D and E). Each drying station comprises a chamber (5) which can be opened for arrival and departure of the form together with the article to be stretched and can be sealed shut, a heating means and an aspiration means (7, 13) for creating in the closed chamber a vacuum suitable for facilitating elimination of moisture from the article.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06C 5/00; F26B 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06C 5/00 (2006.01); F26B 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 5/042 (2013.01); D06C 5/005 (2013.01); F26B 5/045 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9735059 A1 19970925; DE 69703440 D1 20001207; DE 69703440 T2 20010419; EP 0889986 A1 19990113; EP 0889986 B1 20001102; ES 2153182 T3 20010216; IT 1286577 B1 19980715; IT FI960056 A1 19970919; IT FI960056 D0 19960319

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070317

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20030410

2003-01-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021129

2002-11-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20020317

2002-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-03-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020318

2002-03-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020317

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-05-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010523

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-03-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010314

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-03-09 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010309

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-02-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010220

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2153182

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-02-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-02-01 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: UFFICIO TECNICO ING. A. MANNUCCI

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69703440

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-07

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990407

1999-01-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981013

1999-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT