Global Patent Index - EP 0890052 B1

EP 0890052 B1 2001-05-23 - A CLAMPING DEVICE FOR CLAMPING OF TUBES OR THE LIKE

Title (en)

A CLAMPING DEVICE FOR CLAMPING OF TUBES OR THE LIKE

Title (de)

KLEMMVORRICHTUNG ZUM EINKLEMMEN VON ROHREN ODER DERGLEICHEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE SERRAGE POUR BLOQUER TUBES ET ANALOGUES

Publication

EP 0890052 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97919780 A

Priority

  • NO 9700084 W
  • NO 961327 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9737164A1] A clamp device for clamping of at least one tube or the like to a support, comprising a base member (1) having at least one recess (4, 5) for receiving the tube (6) or the like, possibly a top plate (14) at the side of the base member facing away from the support (7), and at least one locking screw (8 resp. 9) carried through mutually aligned holes (15, 10, 11 resp. 16, 12, 13) in the top plate and the base member. The locking screw has a head (17 resp. 18) at one end and a nut (21 resp. 22) at the other end, for keeping the components of the clamp device together as an assembled unit without any loose parts, the head (17 resp. 18) of the screw being arranged to be carried through an elongated hole (19 resp. 20) in the support and locked thereto by tightening of the nut. The base member consists of two halves (2, 3) of which at least one half (3) has at least one recess (5) for clamping receipt of the tube or tubes (6), and the hole or holes (10, 11, 12, 13) through the halves (2, 3) has/have a radial enlargement (24) along a part of its length, so that the head of the associated locking screw can pass into the half (3) nearest to the support (7) or through this half and partly into the other half (2), to allow a limited relative movement of the halves and allow lateral introduction of a tube (6) into the recesses (4, 5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16L 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16L 3/10 (2006.01); F16L 3/237 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16L 3/1075 (2013.01); F16L 3/237 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9737164 A1 19971009; AU 2413697 A 19971022; AU 718407 B2 20000413; CA 2250521 A1 19971009; CA 2250521 C 20061003; CN 1084452 C 20020508; CN 1218549 A 19990602; DE 69704936 D1 20010628; DE 69704936 T2 20020328; DK 0890052 T3 20010917; EP 0890052 A1 19990113; EP 0890052 B1 20010523; ES 2159396 T3 20011001; HK 1020606 A1 20030110; JP 2000507671 A 20000620; JP 3682978 B2 20050817; KR 100448556 B1 20050115; KR 20000005182 A 20000125; NO 305334 B1 19990510; NO 961327 A 19971002; NO 961327 D0 19960401; PL 184290 B1 20020930; PL 329193 A1 19990315; US 6173926 B1 20010116

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170324

2017-04-12 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170324

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120326

2013-07-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130710

2013-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2013-03-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120325

2013-02-07 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69704936

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2012-12-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-11-05 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2012-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120325

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120326

2012-10-30 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-10-10 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121001

2012-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ELVEGAARD EILIF

- Effective date: 20120331

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110329

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110325

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110323

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110323

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110408

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20110321

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110329

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110324

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-04-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20110325

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2159396 T3

2001-09-17 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2001-08-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MARCHI & PARTNERS S.R.L.

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69704936 20010628

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

1999-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990907

1999-01-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981014

1999-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE