Global Patent Index - EP 0890139 B1

EP 0890139 B1 2003-06-04 - PROCESS FOR CONTROLLING THE OPERATION OF A PRINTER, IN PARTICULAR START AND STOP

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR CONTROLLING THE OPERATION OF A PRINTER, IN PARTICULAR START AND STOP

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN DES BETRIEBS EINES DRUCKERS, INSBESONDERE DES START- UND STOPP-BETRIEBS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DU FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE IMPRIMANTE, NOTAMMENT DE LA MISE EN MARCHE ET DE L'ARRET

Publication

EP 0890139 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97918031 A

Priority

  • DE 9700545 W
  • DE 19612639 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9737284A1] A process is disclosed for controlling printing by an electrographic printer in which an endless web of information carrier material is conveyed by a positive engagement drive and by a friction drive. The invention relates in particular to a process for controlling start and stop. Also disclosed is a process for synchronising in an accurate position the parallel displacement of sections of a web and a device for driving a motor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 20/04 (2006.01); B65H 20/18 (2006.01); B65H 20/24 (2006.01); G03G 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/6526 (2013.01); B65H 20/04 (2013.01); B65H 20/18 (2013.01); B65H 20/24 (2013.01); B65H 2511/112 (2013.01); B65H 2511/20 (2013.01); B65H 2513/10 (2013.01); G03G 2215/00459 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/112 + B65H 2220/01
  2. B65H 2511/20 + B65H 2220/02
  3. B65H 2513/10 + B65H 2220/02

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9737284 A1 19971009; EP 0890139 A1 19990113; EP 0890139 B1 20030604

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-01-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59710225

- Effective date: 20121002

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110530

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090317

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090317

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080328

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080331

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *OCE PRINTING SYSTEMS G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59710225 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020510

1999-01-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981029

1999-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB