Global Patent Index - EP 0890142 B1

EP 0890142 B1 2001-12-19 - ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC PRINTING PROCESS FOR PRINTING A SUBSTRATE

Title (en)

ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC PRINTING PROCESS FOR PRINTING A SUBSTRATE

Title (de)

ELEKTROFOTOGRAFISCHES DRUCKVERFAHREN ZUM BEDRUCKEN EINES TRÄGERS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'IMPRESSION ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIQUE POUR IMPRIMER UN SUPPORT

Publication

EP 0890142 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97920508 A

Priority

  • DE 9700510 W
  • DE 19612762 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9737286A1] The invention concerns an electrophotographic printing process as well as an electrophotographic printer for printing a substrate (20), the process comprising the following steps: a photo-sensitive layered system (70) is brought to a homogeneous initial state by impressing an electrical field having a first direction; the photoconductive layer (74) is exposed with predetermined image structures according to the image (step 108); the entire photoconductive layer is exposed uniformly through the cover layer (72) and/or the electrode layer (76) (step 110); charged toner particles are applied to the cover layer in a development step (step 114); the toner image is then transferred to the substrate (step 116); and, if more than one copy is required, the development step and the transfer step are carried out a number of times, the electrical charge image present inside the layered system being retained (steps 114 to 120) and the substrate being conveyed at very high speed by a conveyer device (16).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/22; G03G 13/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 13/045 (2006.01); G03G 13/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 13/045 (2013.01); G03G 13/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9737286 A1 19971009; EP 0890142 A1 19990113; EP 0890142 B1 20011219; US 6162570 A 20001219

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090313

2010-02-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090313

2009-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *OCE PRINTING SYSTEMS G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080328

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080423

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080331

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-02-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705891 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2001-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010504

1999-01-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981029

1999-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB