Global Patent Index - EP 0890182 B1

EP 0890182 B1 2000-04-19 - CONTROL OR SIGNALLING DEVICE SUCH AS A PUSH-BUTTON

Title (en)

CONTROL OR SIGNALLING DEVICE SUCH AS A PUSH-BUTTON

Title (de)

STEUERVORRICHTUNG ODER SIGNALISIERUNGVORRICHTUNG WIE EINE DRUCKTASTE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE OU DE SIGNALISATION TEL QU'UN BOUTON-POUSSOIR

Publication

EP 0890182 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97902396 A

Priority

  • FR 9700171 W
  • FR 9601463 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9728552A1] A control or signalling device such as a push-button or an indicator lamp including one or more electrical units attached to a base is disclosed. The electrical unit (30) and the base (20) include a rigid projection (40) and a hook (50), e.g. a U-shaped hook, and a retaining shoulder (23) and a recess (25) coacting therewith, respectively. The hook is preferably resiliently biased in a direction parallel to the mutual engagement surfaces (32, 27) of the unit and the base, and extends in the same direction as the projection.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 13/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/04 (2006.01); H01H 9/02 (2006.01); H01H 13/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/503 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9728552 A1 19970807; AU 1605797 A 19970822; AU 708627 B2 19990805; BR 9707337 A 19990720; CA 2245245 A1 19970807; CA 2245245 C 20040525; CN 1108618 C 20030514; CN 1212785 A 19990331; DE 69701734 D1 20000525; DE 69701734 T2 20000817; EP 0890182 A1 19990113; EP 0890182 B1 20000419; ES 2146457 T3 20000801; FR 2744560 A1 19970808; FR 2744560 B1 19980327; HU 222938 B1 20031229; HU 9903402 A2 20000228; HU 9903402 A3 20000628; JP 2000504473 A 20000411; JP 3847347 B2 20061122; MX 9806178 A 19981031; PL 184390 B1 20021031; PL 328089 A1 19990104; TR 9801484 T2 19981021; US 6054660 A 20000425

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160130

2017-02-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170227

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160201

2016-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160130

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160131

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160802

2016-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160131

2016-10-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160930

2016-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-08-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69701734

2016-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160131

2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150128

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-05-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150114

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150115

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141208

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150126

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141205

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-12-27 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146457 T3

2000-05-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701734 20000525

2000-05-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2000-03-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SA

1999-08-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SA

1999-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990128

1999-01-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980728

1999-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE