Global Patent Index - EP 0890200 B1

EP 0890200 B1 2003-06-11 - PIN-AND-SOCKET CONNECTOR FOR ELECTRICAL OR ELECTRONIC LINES

Title (en)

PIN-AND-SOCKET CONNECTOR FOR ELECTRICAL OR ELECTRONIC LINES

Title (de)

STECKVERBINDER FÜR ELEKTRISCHE ODER ELEKTRONISCHE LEITUNGEN

Title (fr)

CONNECTEUR A FICHES POUR LIGNES ELECTRIQUES OU ELECTRONIQUES

Publication

EP 0890200 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97951135 A

Priority

  • DE 19645441 A
  • EP 9706093 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19645441A1] Pin-and-socket connector for electrical or electronic lines (1, 2) consisting of a connecting contour containing an electroconductive tip jack with a grip shank (4) and a plug-in shank (5) having a smaller cross-section than the grip shank (4) as well as a plug with plug-in pins (7) corresponding to the tip jacks (3) of the connecting contour, a grip shank (8) as well as a tubular sheath (9) encompassing the plug-in pins (7), the inner contour of said sheath corresponding to the outer contour of the plug-in shank (5), in which the sheath (9) is fitted on its free edge with a peripheral edge flange (10) oriented inwards and the plug-in shank (5) of the connecting contour has a peripheral groove (11) in the position corresponding to the edge flange (10) once the parts have been connected. The elements (4, 5; 8, 9) insulating the electroconductive connecting parts of the connecting contour and the plug consist completely of soft plastic material. The plug-in shank (5) of the connecting contour is fitted with a peripheral seal on its free end.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/52; H01R 13/50; H01R 13/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/50 (2006.01); H01R 13/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/50 (2013.01); H01R 13/5219 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19645441 A1 19980507; CA 2242461 A1 19980514; EP 0890200 A1 19990113; EP 0890200 B1 20030611; HK 1015966 A1 20031107; JP 2002503378 A 20020129; WO 9820582 A1 19980514

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081104

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-09-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081104

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071221

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071119

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071128

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *THOMAS & BETTS G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20031130

2004-04-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-04 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031104

2003-11-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-09-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030922

2003-09-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-09-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59710270 P 20030717

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-06-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030611

2002-11-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 13/52 A, 7H 01R 13/50 B, 7H 01R 13/64 B

2002-11-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 13/52 A, 7H 01R 13/50 B, 7H 01R 13/64 B

1999-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990315

1999-01-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980722

1999-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE