Global Patent Index - EP 0890205 B1

EP 0890205 B1 2003-06-11 - DISTRIBUTION DEVICE FOR A DISTRIBUTION BOARD IN A TELECOMMUNICATION SYSTEM

Title (en)

DISTRIBUTION DEVICE FOR A DISTRIBUTION BOARD IN A TELECOMMUNICATION SYSTEM

Title (de)

VERTEILERVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN VERTEILER IN EINER TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSANLAGE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION D'UN DISTRIBUTEUR DANS UN SYSTEME DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS

Publication

EP 0890205 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97921589 A

Priority

  • DE 9700629 W
  • DE 19612446 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9737407A1] A safety subassembly (12, 31) can be plugged on the rear plug contacts (15) of a contact component (4) of the distribution board. The safety subassembly contains surge arresters (20, 29) connected to an earth conductor (for example 26, 31) which may be contacted with the operational earth of a carrier assembly (2) for the contact components (4). Contact is ensured by earth contacting springs (27) which extend along the narrow front sides of the safety subassembly (12, 13) in the plugging direction. The safety subassembly may thus have a compact design and be earthed at a low cost.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01T 4/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01T 4/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01T 4/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9737407 A1 19971009; AT 242923 T 20030615; AU 2761997 A 19971022; EP 0890205 A1 19990113; EP 0890205 B1 20030611; ES 2201297 T3 20040316

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161001

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161130

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59710271

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150317

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150327

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-03-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090328

2010-05-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090328

2010-02-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CCS TECHNOLOGY INC.

- Effective date: 20090331

2008-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080410

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080326

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-04-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040327

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2201297 T3

2003-12-10 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59710271 P 20030717

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030611

2002-06-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CCS TECHNOLOGY, INC.

2002-04-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DISTRIBUTION DEVICE FOR A DISTRIBUTION BOARD IN A TELECOMMUNICATION SYSTEM

2002-03-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DISTRIBUTION DEVICE FOR A DISTRIBUTION BOARD IN A TELECOMMUNICATION SYSTEM

2000-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991201

1999-01-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980917

1999-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB