Global Patent Index - EP 0890372 A3

EP 0890372 A3 2000-11-08 - Automatically closing fire damper

Title (en)

Automatically closing fire damper

Title (de)

Selbsttätig schliessende Brandschutzeinrichtung

Title (fr)

Clapet coupe-feu à fermeture automatique

Publication

EP 0890372 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98250255 A

Priority

DE 19731180 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0890372A2] At least one swivel mounted shut-off element (1) swivels from an open position parallel with the duct-passage (9) when a fusible soldered body (3) releases the lock under the effect of heat, into a closed position across the duct's axis. The shut-off element has a hinged connection or a spring element (2), pre-tensioned in an open position. The spring element or hinged connection have a bend or recess containing the soldered body and in the form of a holder with U-shaped cavity (2.1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62C 2/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 2/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62C 2/14 (2013.01); A62C 2/242 (2013.01); F24F 13/1413 (2013.01); F24F 2011/0098 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0890372 A2 19990113; EP 0890372 A3 20001108; DE 19731180 A1 19990114; DE 19731180 C2 20030522

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010509

2001-08-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BRUCHHOLD, INGO, DR.

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-01-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI