Global patent index - EP 0890434 B1

EP 0890434 B1 2001-04-04 - Sheet printing machine

Title (en)

Sheet printing machine

Title (de)

Druckmaschine zum Bedrucken von Bogen

Title (fr)

Machine pour imprimer des feuilles

Publication

EP 0890434 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98113761 A

Priority

  • DE 4445457 A
  • EP 95118266 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0718100A1] The deposition system allows a spacer material to be applied to the surface of the printed sheet (1) in the form of discrete spacer particles (2) which are fixed after their application. Pref. the spacer particles have a dia. of between 5 and 30 micrometres and are regularly spaced across the surface of the sheet at a relative spacing of between 50 and 400 micrometres to provide a uniform surface coating.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 23/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 19/00 (2006.01); B05C 19/06 (2006.01); B41F 22/00 (2006.01); B41F 23/06 (2006.01); B41M 7/00 (2006.01); B41M 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 22/00 (2013.01); B41F 23/06 (2013.01); B41M 7/0027 (2013.01); B41M 7/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0718100 A1 19960626; EP 0718100 B1 20000301; AT 190009 T 20000315; AT 200248 T 20010415; DE 4445457 A1 19960704; EP 0890434 A2 19990113; EP 0890434 A3 19990331; EP 0890434 B1 20010404; JP 4010577 B2 20071121; JP H08224978 A 19960903; US 5797326 A 19980825

INPADOC legal status

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081210

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071122

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-01-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070102

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-09-06 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-08-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020730

2002-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-07-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20011121

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-11-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011121

2001-11-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011121

2001-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-06-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010510

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59509163

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-10

2001-04-12 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-04-04 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 718100

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-04-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-04-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 200248

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000721

1999-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-01-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980723

1999-01-13 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 718100

- Country of Ref Document: EP

1999-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI