Global Patent Index - EP 0890496 B1

EP 0890496 B1 2002-09-11 - Monitoring method and device for trackbound transport vehicles

Title (en)

Monitoring method and device for trackbound transport vehicles

Title (de)

Verfahren und Anordnung zur Überwachung eines schienengebundenen Verkehrsmittels

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de surveillance pour véhicules de transport sur rails

Publication

EP 0890496 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98250201 A

Priority

DE 19725308 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0890496A1] A rail train has a video cameras (10) within the carriages (70) that provide input to on board transmitters (20). the transmitted information is relayed to receivers (30) located at intervals along the track. An optical fibre communication line (60) links the receivers to a central monitoring station (40) and this allows activity within the moving train to be observed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61L 3/12; B61L 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61L 3/12 (2006.01); B61L 23/00 (2006.01); B61L 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61L 23/00 (2013.01); B61L 3/125 (2013.01); B61L 27/0077 (2013.01); B61L 27/0094 (2013.01); B61L 2003/226 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19725308 A1 19981217; DE 19725308 C2 19990812; AT 223824 T 20020915; EP 0890496 A1 19990113; EP 0890496 B1 20020911

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070609

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070609

2006-08-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060828

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060626

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060621

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-02-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030609

2003-06-09 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030609

2003-04-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-02-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030109

2002-12-11 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-12-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805480 20021017

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223824 T 20020915

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: REHMET, RALF, DIPL.-ING

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SODJI, FRANCOIS, DIPL.-ING.

2002-01-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: REHMET, RALF, DIPL.-ING

2002-01-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SODJI, FRANCOIS, DIPL.-ING.

2001-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010904

2000-12-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: REHMET, RALF, DIPL.-ING

2000-12-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SODJI, FRANCOIS, DIPL.-ING.

2000-12-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: REHMET, RALF, DIPL.-ING

2000-12-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SODJI, FRANCOIS, DIPL.-ING.

2000-11-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: REHMET, RALF, DIPL.-ING

2000-11-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SODJI, FRANCOIS, DIPL.-ING.

2000-11-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: REHMET, RALF, DIPL.-ING

2000-11-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SODJI, FRANCOIS, DIPL.-ING.

1999-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991001

1999-09-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

1999-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

1999-01-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI