Global Patent Index - EP 0890509 B1

EP 0890509 B1 2002-11-27 - Method and device for tying single objects or stacks of objects

Title (en)

Method and device for tying single objects or stacks of objects

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Umreifen von einzelnen Gegenständen oder von Stapeln von Gegenständen.

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour lier des objets unitaires ou des piles d'objets

Publication

EP 0890509 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98111685 A

Priority

CH 167497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0890509A1] The device has at least one strap feed component (2) which feeds the strap to the strapping position and a strap tensioning-connecting-separating device (5,5'), which tensions the strap around the object or stack, joins the strap ends, and separates the strap from the fed length. The device for producing a strap loop matching the object or stack additionally has two displaceable strap guides (61). The guides are movable on two opposite sides of the conveyor path crossways or parallel to the conveyor direction. Control devices are available for the strap guides.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 13/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0890509 A1 19990113; EP 0890509 B1 20021127; AU 7406998 A 19990121; AU 745401 B2 20020321; AU 745401 C 20021010; CA 2242431 A1 19990109; DE 59806405 D1 20030109; US 6082254 A 20000704

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120630

2013-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120630

2013-04-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806405

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110622

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110615

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090626

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090625

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090625

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090625

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080612

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080624

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070101

2007-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070101

2005-06-15 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050615

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: FERAG AG

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-03-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030217

2003-02-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: FREI PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806405 20030109

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI NL SE

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010516

1999-09-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE GB IT LI NL SE

1999-08-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990628

1999-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI NL SE

1999-01-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI