Global Patent Index - EP 0890535 B1

EP 0890535 B1 2002-09-04 - Sheet feeder device for the single handling and feeding of stacked sheets

Title (en)

Sheet feeder device for the single handling and feeding of stacked sheets

Title (de)

Bogenfördervorrichtung zur individuellen Handhabung und Fördern von gestapelten Bögen

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'alimentation de feuilles pour manipuler et alimenter des feuilles individuellement

Publication

EP 0890535 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98202275 A

Priority

IT MI971618 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0890535A1] A sheet feeder device for the single handling and feeding of stacked sheets, comprising a supporting structure (12) which includes at least one set of suction grabbing elements (15, 16) capable of acting on the upper face of a sheet (13) to be grabbed and transferred, placed at the top of a stack of sheets (14), where at least one group of suction elements (16) oscillates between a grabbing position on the stack and a forward releasing position, while being placed below a supporting structure (12) on an oscillating arm (20) hinged at its top end (in 22) on the shoulders (18) of the structure (12), and where the oscillation is determined by a first recessed cam assembly (23, 24) which draws its motion from a external motorized source acting through a positive mechanical transmission (35-37). A second set of suction elements (15) may be provided and rigidly connected to the same supporting structure (12). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 3/08; B65H 3/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/08 (2006.01); B65H 3/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/0825 (2013.01); B65H 3/38 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0890535 A1 19990113; EP 0890535 B1 20020904; DE 69807607 D1 20021010; DE 69807607 T2 20030605; DE 69807607 T8 20040708; ES 2181119 T3 20030216; IT 1293588 B1 19990308; IT MI971618 A1 19990108; IT MI971618 D0 19970708

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150708

2016-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160826

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160331

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140707

2015-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69807607

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140707

2015-02-27 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-02-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69807607

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140708

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140611

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130703

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130712

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130703

- Year of fee payment: 16

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2181119 T3

2002-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: AMMANN PATENTANWAELTE AG BERN

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69807607 20021010

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB LI

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-04 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2001-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010504

1999-09-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE ES FR GB LI

1999-06-23 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: MAIERON, NATALINA

1999-06-23 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: ROSSI, ALVARO

1999-06-23 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: ROSSI, MARCO

1999-06-23 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: ROSSI, SABRINA

1999-06-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990421

1999-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB LI

1999-01-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI