Global Patent Index - EP 0890543 A3

EP 0890543 A3 2000-12-20 - Side lift intended for handling of ISO containers

Title (en)

Side lift intended for handling of ISO containers

Title (de)

Hebegerät mit seitlicher Aufnahme für ISO Containers

Title (fr)

Appareil de manutention de ISO containers par le côté

Publication

EP 0890543 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98660069 A

Priority

FI 972898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0890543A2] The invention concerns a side lift intended for handling of ISO containers. The side lift (10) is provided with grasping members (11), by whose means an ISO container (1) is grasped from either one of the long sides of the container (1) from the fastening points formed on the container, and the side lift (10) has been mounted at the end of the boom (3) or equivalent of a work machine (2). The invention is characterized in that the side lift (10) has been mounted on a rotation device (14) suspended at the end of a boom (3) or equivalent so that, by means of said rotation device (14), the side lift (10) and the ISO container (1) attached to said side lift can be rotated substantially freely around a substantially vertical axis (R) of rotation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 1/10; B66F 9/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 1/66 (2006.01); B66F 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/186 (2013.01); B66C 1/663 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0890543 A2 19990113; EP 0890543 A3 20001220; FI 101956 B1 19980930; FI 101956 B 19980930; FI 972898 A0 19970708

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030808

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020620

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE NL

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010620

2001-08-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KALMAR INDUSTRIES OY AB

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE NL

1999-01-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI