EP 0890654 A1 19990113 - Apparatus for uniforming the gas pressure distribution at the output port of a flat-jet nozzle
Title (en)
Apparatus for uniforming the gas pressure distribution at the output port of a flat-jet nozzle
Title (de)
Vorrichtung zur Vergleichmässigung der Gasdruckverteilung über die Austrittsöff nung einer Flachstrahldüse
Title (fr)
Appareil pour l'uniformisation de la répartition de la pression des gaz à l'orifice de sortie d'une buse à jet plat
Publication
Application
Priority
DE 19729232 A 19970709
Abstract (en)
The apparatus for levelling the gas pressure distribution of the outlet opening of flat jet nozzle (8, 9) incorporates an inner pipe (2) and a surrounding outer pipe (1). Each of these pipes has a number of parallel gas outlet openings which can be adjusted relative to one another such that the openings of the inner pipe are partially or fully overlapped by the openings of the outer pipe. At the same time, this overlap of the openings is oriented symmetrically relative to the outlet opening of the flat jet nozzle.
Abstract (de)
Es wird eine Vorrichtung zur Vergleichmäßigung der Gasdruckverteilung über die Austrittsöffnung einer Flachstrahldüse beschrieben. Kennzeichen der erfindungsgemäßen Vorrichtung ist ein mit dem aus der Flachstrahldüse auszublasenden Gas beaufschlagbares Innenrohr (2) und ein dieses umschließendes Außenrohr (1), wobei das Innenrohr und das Außenrohr jeweils eine Vielzahl zueinander beabstandeter, in Rohrlängsrichtung angeordneter Gasaustrittsöffnungen aufweisen und relativ zueinander derart verstellbar sind, daß die Gasaustrittsöffnungen des Innenrohrs (2) mit den Gasaustrittsöffnungen (5) des Außenrohrs (1) je nach Grad der Verstellung teilweise oder vollständig in Überdeckung gelangen, wobei die Gasaustrittsöffnungen des Innenrohres (2) und des Außenrohres (1) bei teilweiser oder vollständiger Überdeckung im wesentlichen symmetrisch zur Austrittsöffnung der Flachstrahldüse angeordnet sind. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
C23C 2/20 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
C23C 2/20 (2013.01)
Citation (applicant)
- DE 4024229 C1 19910718
- DE 2046441 A1 19720803 - WHEELING PITTSBURGH STEEL CORP
Citation (search report)
- [A] US 4499853 A 19850219 - MILLER EDWARD A [US]
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 007, no. 135 (C - 170) 11 June 1983 (1983-06-11)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 222 (C - 302) 9 September 1985 (1985-09-09)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 093 (C - 1029) 24 February 1993 (1993-02-24)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE DE FI FR GB IT LU NL SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0890654 A1 19990113; EP 0890654 B1 20010829; AT E204925 T1 20010915; DE 19729232 C1 19990408; DE 59801291 D1 20011004
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 98110783 A 19980612; AT 98110783 T 19980612; DE 19729232 A 19970709; DE 59801291 T 19980612