Global Patent Index - EP 0890665 B1

EP 0890665 B1 2000-11-22 - Weft yarn tensioning device and loom with such a device

Title (en)

Weft yarn tensioning device and loom with such a device

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Spannen eines Schussfadens und Webmaschine mit einer derartigen Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour tendre un fil de trame et métier à tisser équipé d'un tel dispositif

Publication

EP 0890665 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97810454 A

Priority

EP 97810454 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0890665A1] The appts. to tense a weft yarn, at a loom, has a guide unit (3) with a guide plane (11) for the weft. The retractor (2) moves on a circular path, to deflect the weft within the guide plane. The rotary axis (14) of the retractor (2) is angled to the guide plane so that, within one rotation, the retractor passes over the weft path to give a catch and a release point for the weft.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/34 (2013.01); B65H 59/34 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0890665 A1 19990113; EP 0890665 B1 20001122; DE 59702662 D1 20001228

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SULZER TEXTIL A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20050731

2006-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050709

2004-08-04 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040804

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-07-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040706

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-11-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-04-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-02-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-12-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702662

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-28

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

2000-01-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SULZER TEXTIL AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-12-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

1999-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990930

1999-10-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

1999-09-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH LI

1999-08-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990614

1999-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

1999-01-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI