Global Patent Index - EP 0890671 A3

EP 0890671 A3 2000-02-23 - Use of modified fatty amines for preventing deposition of low molecular weight by-products on textile materials

Title (en)

Use of modified fatty amines for preventing deposition of low molecular weight by-products on textile materials

Title (de)

Verwendung von modifizierten Fettaminen zur Verhinderung von Ablagerungen von niedermolekularen Nebenprodukten auf textilen Materialien

Title (fr)

Utilisation d'amines grasses modifiées pour éviter le dépôt de sous produits de bas poids moléculaire sur les matières textiles

Publication

EP 0890671 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98810611 A

Priority

CH 168897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5911902A] The present invention relates to the use of a modified fatty amine of formula R-NR3-(R1-O)n-R2(1), wherein R is C9-C24alkyl or acyl, R1 is C2-C4alkylene, R2 is hydrogen, C1-C4alkyl or acyl, R3 is hydrogen or (R1-O)m, n and m are each independently of the other an integer from 2 to 100, and (R1-O)n is n identical or different radicals (R1-O), and (R1-O)m is m identical or different radicals (R1-O), for reducing or preventing low molecular weight by-product deposits developing in the course of the polyester fiber material production process on textile materials consisting of polyester fibers or containing these fibers in blends with other fibers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06M 13/372; D06M 13/144; D06M 13/17; D06M 13/256; D06M 13/262; D06M 13/292; D06M 15/53; D06P 1/607; D06P 1/613; D06P 1/62; D06P 1/642; D06P 1/651; D06P 1/667

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06P 1/607 (2006.01); D06M 13/02 (2006.01); D06M 13/144 (2006.01); D06M 13/148 (2006.01); D06M 13/17 (2006.01); D06M 13/244 (2006.01); D06M 13/248 (2006.01); D06M 13/256 (2006.01); D06M 13/262 (2006.01); D06M 13/268 (2006.01); D06M 13/292 (2006.01); D06M 13/295 (2006.01); D06M 13/322 (2006.01); D06M 13/325 (2006.01); D06M 13/328 (2006.01); D06M 13/342 (2006.01); D06M 13/345 (2006.01); D06M 13/372 (2006.01); D06M 15/53 (2006.01); D06P 1/613 (2006.01); D06P 1/62 (2006.01); D06P 1/645 (2006.01); D06P 1/667 (2006.01); D06P 5/06 (2006.01); D06M 101/00 (2006.01); D06M 101/16 (2006.01); D06M 101/30 (2006.01); D06M 101/32 (2006.01); D06P 3/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06P 5/06 (2013.01); D06M 13/144 (2013.01); D06M 13/17 (2013.01); D06M 13/256 (2013.01); D06M 13/262 (2013.01); D06M 13/292 (2013.01); D06M 13/295 (2013.01); D06M 13/325 (2013.01); D06M 13/372 (2013.01); D06M 15/53 (2013.01); D06P 1/6138 (2013.01); D06P 1/625 (2013.01); D06P 1/645 (2013.01); D06P 1/667 (2013.01); D06M 2101/32 (2013.01); D06P 3/54 (2013.01); Y10S 8/93 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5911902 A 19990615; AU 733934 B2 20010531; AU 7508698 A 19990121; CN 1205374 A 19990120; EP 0890671 A2 19990113; EP 0890671 A3 20000223; ID 20986 A 19990401; JP H1181145 A 19990326

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020201

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE DK FR GB IT LI SE

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990610

1999-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB IT LI SE

1999-01-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI