Global Patent Index - EP 0890732 A3

EP 0890732 A3 2001-12-05 - Electromagnetically actuatable valve

Title (en)

Electromagnetically actuatable valve

Title (de)

Elektromagnetisch betätigbares Ventil

Title (fr)

Soupape à commande électromagnétique

Publication

EP 0890732 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98104630 A

Priority

DE 19729304 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0890732A2] The valve has a core at least partially enclosed in a magnet coil. It has a valve needle consisting of an armature (20) and a valve seal (22) held together by a plastic body with the seal functioning in combination with a valve seat. The plastic body has an internal opening (46) and an external guide surface for guiding the valve needle axially. The internal opening terminates in not less than one flow outlet (48). The outlet has a radial component which opens out down stream of the guide surface on the external contour of the plastic body

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 51/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02M 51/08 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/0682 (2013.01); F02M 51/0664 (2013.01); F02M 51/0667 (2013.01); F02M 61/166 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0890732 A2 19990113; EP 0890732 A3 20011205; DE 19729304 A1 19990114

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030210

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2002-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020605

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-01-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI