Global patent index - EP 0890785 A3

EP 0890785 A3 2001-01-17 - Vehicle headlights

Title (en)

Vehicle headlights

Title (de)

Scheinwerfer für Fahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Projecteur de véhicule

Publication

EP 0890785 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98112725 A

Priority

  • DE 19729478 A
  • DE 19814478 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0890785A2] The headlamp has a reflector (10). It has a light source (12), a lens (16) through which the light from the reflector passes and an at least partially transparent element (40) partially enclosing the circumference of the lens. Light from the source which misses the reflector passes through the transparent enclosing element, which this element is at least partially in the form of a Fresnel lens with annular optical profiles (42).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21M 3/05; F21M 7/00; F21V 5/04; F21V 7/00; G02B 3/08; F21S 8/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/12 (2006.01); F21V 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/1233 (2013.01); F21S 48/125 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0890785 A2 19990113; EP 0890785 A3 20010117; EP 0890785 B1 20060830; DE 59813700 D1 20061012; US 6220736 B1 20010424

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140331

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120803

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-01-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-12-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061211

2006-10-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59813700

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-10-12

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2006-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060830

2006-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: F21V 5/04 20060101AFI20060328BHEP

2006-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: G02B 3/08 20060101ALI20060328BHEP

2006-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: F21S 8/10 20060101ALI20060328BHEP

2006-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: F21V 7/00 20060101ALI20060328BHEP

2006-01-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DOBLER, KARL-OTTO

2006-01-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHUSTER, KURT

2006-01-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WULF, JUERGEN, DR.

2006-01-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHIEN, ANDREAS

2006-01-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: NAGEL, KLAUS

2006-01-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BOEBEL, DORIS

2004-08-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AUTOMOTIVE LIGHTING REUTLINGEN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR IT

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010717

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 21M 3/05 A, 7F 21M 7/00 B, 7F 21V 5/04 B, 7G 02B 3/08 B, 7F 21S 8/10 B, 7F 21V 7/00 B

1999-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

1999-01-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI