Global patent index - EP 0890786 A3

EP 0890786 A3 2000-07-26 - Lamp

Title (en)

Lamp

Title (de)

Leuchte

Title (fr)

Lampe

Publication

EP 0890786 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98112607 A

Priority

DE 29712055 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19828855A1] This novel light is for internal and external installation. The illuminating shade is made of hard plastic foam (11), its outside (19) at least partially coated with an outer layer (12) simulating a material. Preferably, the body is formed from a polystyrene blank. The outer layer fits to a structure and/or a relief on a wall. It may be applied as a loose layer impregnated with the protective skin and an applied covering layer. A plastic resin may be used, which comprises polyester, polyurethane or acrylic resin. The protective skin is a protective powder layer or a sand layer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/00 (2006.01); F21V 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/033 (2013.01); F21V 15/01 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29712055 U1 19970911; DE 19828855 A1 19990204; EP 0890786 A2 19990113; EP 0890786 A3 20000726

INPADOC legal status

2002-02-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010201

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-01-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI