Global Patent Index - EP 0890799 A3

EP 0890799 A3 2000-07-19 - Radiator suspension

Title (en)

Radiator suspension

Title (de)

Heizkörperaufhängung

Title (fr)

Suspension pour radiateur

Publication

EP 0890799 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98202231 A

Priority

BE 9700584 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0890799A2] Radiator suspension for suspending a radiator of a central heating system to an upright wall, characterised in that it comprises a metal panel (1), means (2) for attaching this panel (1) to a wall (3) and means (4) provided on this panel (1) for suspending a radiator (5) to it. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24D 19/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/02 (2006.01); F24D 19/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/023 (2013.01); F24D 19/02 (2013.01); F24D 19/0216 (2013.01); F24D 19/0236 (2013.01); F24D 19/061 (2013.01); F24D 2220/2054 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0890799 A2 19990113; EP 0890799 A3 20000719; BE 1011259 A6 19990601

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010122

2001-05-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-01-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI