Global Patent Index - EP 0890800 A3

EP 0890800 A3 2000-09-13 - Radiator with one or more plates having at least two different sections

Title (en)

Radiator with one or more plates having at least two different sections

Title (de)

Ein- oder mehrreihiger Heizkörper mit zumindest zwei verschieden ausgelegten Abschnitten

Title (fr)

Radiateur a une ou a plusieurs plaques avec au moins deux sections différentes

Publication

EP 0890800 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98111996 A

Priority

DE 19729633 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0890800A2] The first section of the radiator, which faces the room to be heated, is uniformly passed by the heating medium before the other sections which can be set behind same. A connection to the at least one other section is preferably only provided at the lower end of the first section. The first section (1) is designed so that at least with a lower heat output more heat is supplied to this first section than to the other sections. The overall length of the flow channels in the first section is greater than in the remaining sections. The first section can be mounted above or below the second section and both sections are preferably formed in one radiator panel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24D 19/10; F24H 9/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28F 3/00 (2006.01); B21D 53/02 (2006.01); F24H 9/12 (2006.01); F28D 1/03 (2006.01); F28F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 1/0308 (2013.01); F24D 19/0002 (2013.01); F24D 19/0073 (2013.01); F28F 3/025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0890800 A2 19990113; EP 0890800 A3 20000913; EP 0890800 B1 20020807; AT 221978 T 20020815; CZ 9802158 A3 19990317; DE 19729633 A1 19990114; DE 19729633 C2 20030417; PL 327305 A1 19990118; SK 95298 A3 19990211

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-07-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030508

2003-02-05 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020807

2002-09-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805072 20020912

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2002-08-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-07 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020807

2002-08-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020807

2002-08-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020807

2002-08-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 221978 T 20020815

2001-07-11 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2001-07-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000922

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 24D 19/10 A, 7F 24H 9/12 B

1999-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

1999-01-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI