Global Patent Index - EP 0890807 B1

EP 0890807 B1 2002-11-13 - Process and apparatus for drying work pieces with a surface coating

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for drying work pieces with a surface coating

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Trocknen von mit einer Oberflächenbeschichtung versehenen Werkstücken

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de séchage de pièces pourvues d'une couche superficielle

Publication

EP 0890807 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98112368 A

Priority

DE 19729147 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0890807A1] At least a part of the walls in the area of the conveyor zone (3') and/or structures of the drying zone (3) is fed with hot air. The walls are located in the area of an output air channel (15) for feed-back of the hot air. The walls form at least one section of the under side (29) of an output air channel (15). The output air channel is located above the conveyor zone of the workpiece conveyor device, and extends in the conveyor direction. At least one side of the output air channel is provided with an input air channel (7,8) for feed of input air. The input air channel has several outlet apertures (27,28) from which the hot air emerges for feed to the walls or the structures.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F26B 15/08 (2006.01); F26B 21/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 21/02 (2013.01); F26B 15/085 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0890807 A1 19990113; EP 0890807 B1 20021113; DE 19729147 A1 19990114; DE 19729147 C2 20020418; DE 59806247 D1 20021219; ES 2186054 T3 20030501; US 6065225 A 20000523

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-04 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59806247

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170831

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170814

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140704

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140704

2015-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140704

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130723

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130724

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-05-23 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: KBA-METALPRINT GMBH

- Effective date: 20120510

2012-04-11 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120315 AND 20120321

2012-01-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KBA-METALPRINT GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LTG HOLDING GMBH, 70435 STUTTGART, DE

- Document: DE 59806247

- Effective date: 20111115

2011-09-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59806247

2004-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040201

2004-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040201

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186054 T3

2003-02-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030205

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806247 20021219

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010410

1999-09-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT NL

1999-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990121

1999-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL

1999-01-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI