Global Patent Index - EP 0890814 A3

EP 0890814 A3 2000-08-16 - Gun barrel

Title (en)

Gun barrel

Title (de)

Waffenrohr

Title (fr)

Tube de canon

Publication

EP 0890814 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98109071 A

Priority

DE 19729294 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0890814A2] A gunbarrel is drawn, with rifling lands and grooves all the way round the periphery. The amount of missile guide-band material (9) displaced remains the same when the number of grooves (3) is increased, while the groove depth (6) and the twist angle (d) remain constant. To reduce the rate of band wear when the number of grooves is increased, the groove flanks (5) can be at right angles to be bottom (7). The flank angle(a) can be less then 9.5 degrees with a non-chromium-plated bore, and 0 degrees when this is partly or wholly chromium-plated. The radius (rZ) between the groove bottom and flank can be less than 0.5mm, and that between the flank and the land surface (rF) less than 0.3mm.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 21/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 21/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 21/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0890814 A2 19990113; EP 0890814 A3 20000816; EP 0890814 B1 20030212; AT 232594 T 20030215; DE 19729294 A1 19990114; ES 2190005 T3 20030716; JP 3626348 B2 20050309; JP H1172298 A 19990316; NO 982328 A 19990111; NO 982328 D0 19980522; US 6170187 B1 20010109

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161201

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160531

2017-03-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160519

2017-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160520

2016-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59807159

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150515

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150520

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150527

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-16 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 59807159

- Effective date: 20150305

2015-03-05 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 59807159

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090519

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090519

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080522

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-05-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040519

2004-02-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-10-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2190005 T3

2003-05-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030411

2003-05-06 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030506

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807159 P 20030320

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-02-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000801

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RHEINMETALL W & M GMBH

1999-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-01-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI