Global Patent Index - EP 0890816 A3

EP 0890816 A3 2000-03-22 - Pivoting semiautomatic rifle

Title (en)

Pivoting semiautomatic rifle

Title (de)

Halbautomatisches Kipplaufgewehr

Title (fr)

Arme à feu à canon pivotant

Publication

EP 0890816 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98830375 A

Priority

IT BS970073 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0890816A2] The present invention pertains to a semiautonlatic sports rifle and shotgun in which the barrel (14) is hinged (21) or Äsic - Tr.Ed.Ü to the pivot (11) for its rotation between a position of closing and alignment with the breechblock unit in the pivot and a position of opening that is angled with respect to the pivot. The cartridges are fed from a side, and the cartridge cases are removed from the bottom of the pivot. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41C 7/11

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41C 7/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41C 7/11 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0890816 A2 19990113; EP 0890816 A3 20000322; IT 238339 Y1 20001016; IT BS970073 U1 19990108; IT BS970073 V0 19970708; JP H11118392 A 19990430; TR 9801313 A2 19990118; TR 9801313 A3 19990118

INPADOC legal status


2001-07-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000923

2001-01-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-06-28 [K1C3] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (COMPLETE REPRINT) PUBLISHED

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-01-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI