Global patent index - EP 0890818 A3

EP 0890818 A3 2000-03-08 - Shooting simulation method and apparatus for carrying out the method

Title (en)

Shooting simulation method and apparatus for carrying out the method

Title (de)

Schusssimulationsverfahren und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé de simulation de tir et dispositif pour l'exécution du procédé

Publication

EP 0890818 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98103894 A

Priority

DE 19729475 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19729475C1] The target system has at least one retro-reflector (2). The laser impulse transmitter incorporates at least two transmitters for selective emission of different wavelengths. The retro-reflector has an active or passive pre-connected selective filter (1) or an active or passive selective coating (3) on at least one of its reflecting surfaces or the light signal receiver has a preconnected active or passive selective filter. The selective filter is an edge filter, a band pass filter or a piezo-controlled filter. With the use of a selective filter with a passive selective coating on at least one of its surfaces a coupling body is available, which gives passage to the selected pulsed laser beam. A receiver analyses and registers the laser beam and controls the stopping or allowing passage of selectable wavelengths.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41G 3/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41G 3/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41G 3/2683 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19729475 C1 19980430; EP 0890818 A2 19990113; EP 0890818 A3 20000308; EP 0890818 B1 20030604; ES 2200223 T3 20040301; US 6139323 A 20001031

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160516

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160511

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160429

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160429

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-04-25 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: RUAG DEFENCE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20140327

2014-03-14 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: RUAG DEFENCE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2006-03-05 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060305

2005-03-14 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050314

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2200223

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-10-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATMED AG

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH ES FI FR GB LI

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH ES FI FR GB LI

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000331

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH ES FI FR GB LI

1999-01-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI