Global Patent Index - EP 0890887 B1

EP 0890887 B1 2001-12-12 - Solar battery powered watch

Title (en)

Solar battery powered watch

Title (de)

Durch Solarbatterie gespeiste Uhr

Title (fr)

Montre alimentée par batterie solaire

Publication

EP 0890887 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98114932 A

Priority

  • EP 95930724 A
  • JP 21452494 A
  • JP 21982794 A
  • JP 24045294 A
  • JP 31167194 A
  • JP 11274395 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0890887A1] A covering member (4), a solar battery (3) and a hand-operating mechanism-containing movement (2) are housed inside a case (1) which has a front side opening (1a), a glass (5) which is provided in the front side opening (1a), in the order of these constituents from the face side of the case (1). The solar battery (3) is disposed opposite to the glass (5) at a light receiving surface thereof which is covered with the covering member (4). The covering member (4) also serves as a dial, and light reflection layers (11) improve the light transmittance to the receiving surface of the solar battery (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 19/06; G04C 10/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/06 (2006.01); G04B 19/12 (2006.01); G04B 19/14 (2006.01); G04C 10/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04C 10/02 (2013.01); G04B 19/065 (2013.01); G04B 19/12 (2013.01); G04B 19/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0890887 A1 19990113; EP 0890887 B1 20011212; DE 69514814 D1 20000302; DE 69514814 T2 20000621; DE 69524642 D1 20020124; DE 69524642 T2 20020808; EP 0780741 A1 19970625; EP 0780741 A4 19970716; EP 0780741 B1 20000126; WO 9607956 A1 19960314

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2005-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2004-09-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040915

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-09-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040902

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69524642 20020124

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-12 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 780741

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI

2001-11-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CITIZEN WATCH CO. LTD.

2001-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001124

1999-01-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980807

1999-01-13 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 780741

1999-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI