Global Patent Index - EP 0890937 A3

EP 0890937 A3 2000-05-31 - Device for transmitting data from a vehicle

Title (en)

Device for transmitting data from a vehicle

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Übertragung von Daten aus einem Kraftfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Dispositif de transmission de données à partir d'un véhicule

Publication

EP 0890937 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98111678 A

Priority

DE 19729105 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0890937A2] A transmitter/receiver (1) acts as a terminal for a mobile radiotelephone network, having an interface (3) for data input. Data is transferred as information from a terminal to fixed equipment. The terminal's interface (3) is connected to an interface module (5,23,41,45), having input points for data (6 to 12, 24 to 28) and/or for company business and/or information. The terminal's interface is connected to the interface module through a serial data line (4) and a CAN bus (20). The interface module (41) is connected to a CAN controller (42). The interface module (23) has a microcomputer (14) for entering company business and/or data as well as a CAN controller connected to the microcomputer and the CAN bus. Data can be entered through a CAN controller (21,22) and a CAN bus connected to the terminal's interface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/127

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07C 5/00 (2006.01); F02D 45/00 (2006.01); G01S 5/14 (2006.01); G06F 13/38 (2006.01); G08G 1/127 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/127 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0890937 A2 19990113; EP 0890937 A3 20000531; DE 19729105 A1 19990114; JP H11163894 A 19990618

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-14 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030321

2002-06-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020510

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-01-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI