Global Patent Index - EP 0890976 B1

EP 0890976 B1 2002-09-18 - High pressure discharge lamp

Title (en)

High pressure discharge lamp

Title (de)

Hochdruckentladungslampe

Title (fr)

Lampe à décharge haute pression

Publication

EP 0890976 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98111186 A

Priority

DE 29712013 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0890976A2] The lamp consists of an outer bulb with two discharge vessels located inside approximately in parallel and containing electrodes and a filling. A support base fixes the discharge vessels inside the outer bulb. At least at one end the vessel are connected electrically through bushings by a connector. The connector is a stamping part (27) located at 90 degrees to the lamp axis and consisting of two half sections. Each half (14) consists of a frame (17) containing a sprung section (22). The frame can be made up of four segments with the sprung section set in one of the segments.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 61/34; H01J 5/54; H01J 61/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/34 (2006.01); H01J 61/92 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/34 (2013.01); H01J 61/92 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29712013 U1 19981217; AT 224585 T 20021015; EP 0890976 A2 19990113; EP 0890976 A3 19990414; EP 0890976 B1 20020918; HU 220725 B1 20020528; HU 9801517 A2 19990428; HU 9801517 A3 20001128; HU 9801517 D0 19980928; JP H1173914 A 19990316

INPADOC legal status


2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070618

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2008-03-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070618

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PATENT-TREUHAND-G.- FUR ELEKTRISCHE GLUHLAMPEN M.

- Effective date: 20070630

2006-08-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060821

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-20 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060620

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-16 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060616

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060613

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-06-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050618

2005-04-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2004-06-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-02-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030627

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-05-14 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030514

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805583 20021024

2002-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224585 T 20021015

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011129

1999-12-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

1999-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990505

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

1999-01-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI