Global Patent Index - EP 0891012 A3

EP 0891012 A3 2000-02-02 - Electrical connection device

Title (en)

Electrical connection device

Title (de)

Elektrische Steckvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de connexion électrique

Publication

EP 0891012 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98112081 A

Priority

DE 19729410 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0891012A2] An electrical plug-in device for a consumer branch (5) which is mountable on a bus-bar system (1), and including a plug (11) with a number of plug-contacts (18) arranged next to one another in one contact plane (26). The plug-in device contact with corresponding contact elements (13) of the consumer branch (5) is releasable by a movement of the consumer branch (5) transversely to the plug-in direction (x) of the plug (11). The consumer branch (5) has a socket-outlet (15) open towards the bus-bar system (1) for receiving the plug (11). The contact element (13) or each contact element of the consumer branch (5) is movably and flexibly held transversely to the plug-in direction (x) of the plug (11).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/24; H01R 23/02; H01R 25/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/73 (2006.01); H01R 24/00 (2006.01); H01R 24/62 (2011.01); H01R 25/14 (2006.01); H02B 1/052 (2006.01); H02B 1/20 (2006.01); H01R 13/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 25/142 (2013.01); H01R 24/62 (2013.01); H01R 13/2421 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19729410 C1 19981203; EP 0891012 A2 19990113; EP 0891012 A3 20000202

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040103

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR IT LI

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000303

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 13/24 A, 7H 01R 23/02 B, 7H 01R 25/14 B

1999-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

1999-01-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI