Global Patent Index - EP 0891118 B1

EP 0891118 B1 2002-09-18 - Heating element and household appliance, especially steam pressing iron, using such an element and method for fabricating the steam pressing iron

Title (en)

Heating element and household appliance, especially steam pressing iron, using such an element and method for fabricating the steam pressing iron

Title (de)

Heizelement und Haushaltgerät, insbesonderes Dampfbügeleisen, mit einem solchen Element und Verfahren zur Herstellung des Dampfbügeleisens

Title (fr)

Elément chauffant et appareil électroménager, notamment fer à repasser à vapeur, comportant un tel élément et procédé d'obtention du fer à repasser

Publication

EP 0891118 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98401731 A

Priority

FR 9708804 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0891118A1] The heating element comprises a resistance circuit (2) through which an electric current passes and which is in thermal contact with the inner surface of a heat conducting plate (3) or sole plate through electrical insulators. The resistance circuit is a thin layer of material, and the insulators are provided by a ceramic layer (4,4a,4b) with its upper face receiving the resistance circuit and its lower one in contact with the inner surface of the sole plate. The thin layer forming the resistance circuit is made from tin oxide, zinc oxide or an organo-metallic material, applied in droplet or vapour form. The layer is divided into a series of conducting strips lying parallel to one another and distributed so as to cover the whole of the ceramic layer, ensuring a constant surface power. The conducting strips can also be formed by engraving or masking and are linked in series by connectors.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 3/26; D06F 75/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 75/24 (2006.01); H05B 3/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/265 (2013.01); D06F 75/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0891118 A1 19990113; EP 0891118 B1 20020918; AT 224630 T 20021015; DE 69807995 D1 20021024; DE 69807995 T2 20030731; ES 2181140 T3 20030216; FR 2766047 A1 19990115; FR 2766047 B1 19990924

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030709

2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040201

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030708

2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040201

2004-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *SEB

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030708

2003-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2181140 T3

2002-11-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021011

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69807995 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224630 T 20021015

2002-01-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: HEATING ELEMENT AND HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE, ESPECIALLY STEAM PRESSING IRON, USING SUCH AN ELEMENT AND METHOD FOR FABRICATING THE STEAM PRESSING IRON

2001-12-19 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: HEATING ELEMENT AND HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE, ESPECIALLY STEAM PRESSING IRON, USING SUCH AN ELEMENT AND METHOD FOR FABRICATING THE STEAM PRESSING IRON

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010410

1999-09-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

1999-09-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990713

1999-01-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

1999-01-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI