Global Patent Index - EP 0891287 B1

EP 0891287 B1 2000-05-24 - DEVICE FOR ORIENTING FLAT DESPATCHES

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR ORIENTING FLAT DESPATCHES

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUSRICHTEN VON FLACHEN SENDUNGEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR L'ALIGNEMENT D'ARTICLES EXPEDIES PLATS

Publication

EP 0891287 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97908269 A

Priority

  • DE 19612567 A
  • EP 9701394 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19612567A1] The device is designed to orient flat despatches which are inclined to the extraction plane of a sorter and supported on one edge in stacks by a supporting surface and oriented towards a stopping face while being transported by a conveyor moving towards the extraction point. The sorter has at least two extraction belts (2) and suction apertures which act by friction and suction on the despatch (10) to be extracted. According to the invention, two sensors (3, 4) spring-loaded in the direction of the despatch stack and spaced apart project between two extraction belts (2) and are each coupled to a switch connected to the conveyor drive control, where the switching point is just before the extractor belts (2) and the conveyor is switched off as soon as the switches of both sensors issue a switching signal to the conveyor drive control.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 1/24; B65H 1/14; B65H 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/12 (2006.01); B65H 1/14 (2006.01); B65H 1/24 (2006.01); B65H 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/025 (2013.01); B65H 1/24 (2013.01); B65H 9/00 (2013.01); B65H 2511/214 (2013.01); B65H 2513/512 (2013.01); B65H 2513/514 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1916 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/214 + B65H 2220/01
  2. B65H 2513/512 + B65H 2220/02 + B65H 2220/11
  3. B65H 2513/514 + B65H 2220/02 + B65H 2220/11

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19612567 A1 19971002; DE 19612567 C2 19990429; EP 0891287 A1 19990120; EP 0891287 B1 20000524; JP 2000506480 A 20000530; JP 3725163 B2 20051207; WO 9736810 A1 19971009

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120320

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2013-01-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59701767

- Effective date: 20121002

2012-12-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120320

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110520

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110310

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110321

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080320

2009-02-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SIEMENS A.G.

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-01-02 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070321

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070524

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-03-21 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070321

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-08-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701767 20000629

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

1999-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990708

1999-01-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980917

1999-01-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT