Global Patent Index - EP 0891288 B1

EP 0891288 B1 2001-05-23 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR PREVENTING DOUBLE EXTRACTION

Title (en)

PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR PREVENTING DOUBLE EXTRACTION

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERHINDERN VON DOPPELABZÜGEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR EMPECHER DES ENLEVEMENTS EN DOUBLE

Publication

EP 0891288 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97908268 A

Priority

  • DE 19612566 A
  • EP 9701393 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19612566A1] The invention relates to a process and a device for preventing double extraction in a sorting device for flat objects like letters, cards, documents and the like, in which there are on one side of the conveyor at least one extractor belt running in the conveying direction and taking the flat objects with it by friction and on the other side at least one slide-shaped remover (1) to retain excess objects removed, which is fitted to move in relation to the plane of the flat objects by means of a guide arm (11) and pressed against said objects by a controlling torque. According to the invention, in order to reduce the pressure of the objects during the extraction process, channels (2) are made in the remover extending into the working surface in contact with the flat objects. Said channels are connected to a suction pump. The underpressure generated by the suction pump is adjustable and can be applied and cut off. In a corresponding process the suction pump is operative only when the extraction system is running.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 3/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/5223 (2013.01); B65H 2406/30 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1916 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19612566 A1 19971002; DE 19612566 C2 19990225; EP 0891288 A1 19990120; EP 0891288 B1 20010523; WO 9736811 A1 19971009

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080320

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080320

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-02-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-12-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081125

2008-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080320

2008-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SIEMENS A.G.

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070320

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070524

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-05-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070521

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-03-21 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070321

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-03-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070313

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-08-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703600 20010628

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2000-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000704

1999-01-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980917

1999-01-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT