Global patent index - EP 0891349 A4

EP 0891349 A4 2001-01-24 - INHIBITORS OF FARNESYL-PROTEIN TRANSFERASE

Title (en)

INHIBITORS OF FARNESYL-PROTEIN TRANSFERASE

Title (de)

INHIBITOREN VON FARNESYLPROTEIN-TRANSFERASE

Title (fr)

INHIBITEURS DE FARNESYL-PROTEINE TRANSFERASE

Publication

EP 0891349 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97917599 A

Priority

  • GB 9613461 A
  • US 9704711 W
  • US 1458796 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9736888A1] The present invention is directed to compounds which inhibit farnesyl-protein transferase (FTase) and the farnesylation of the oncogene protein Ras. The invention is further directed to chemotherapeutic compositions containing the compounds of this invention and methods for inhibiting farnesyl-protein transferase and the farnesylation of the oncogene protein Ras.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 403/00; A61K 31/495

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/495 (2006.01); A61K 31/496 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 13/00 (2006.01); A61P 13/12 (2006.01); A61P 27/00 (2006.01); A61P 27/02 (2006.01); A61P 31/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 401/06 (2006.01); C07D 403/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 401/06 (2013.01); C07D 403/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0670314 A1 19950906 - KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP]
  • [Y] WO 9500497 A1 19950105 - MERCK & CO INC [US], et al
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 003, no. 128 24 October 1979 (1979-10-24)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 080 11 March 1998 (1998-03-11)
  • [X] N. SHIMAZAKI ET AL.: "Diketopiperazine derivatives, a new synthesis of platelet-activating factor inhibitors", CHEM. PHARM. BULL., vol. 35, no. 8, 1987, pages 3527 - 3530, XP000941477
  • [X] T. D. HARRIS ET AL.: "An Improved Synthesis of 1-Methyl-2,5-piperazinedione", J. HETEROCYCL. CHEM., vol. 18, no. 1, 1981, pages 423 - 424, XP000943271
  • [X] T. FUKUYAMA ET AL.: "Total synthesis of gliotoxin, dehydrogliotoxin and hyalodendrin", TETRAHEDRON, vol. 37, 1981, pages 2045 - 2078, XP000941476
  • [X] B. H. CHASE, A. M. DOWNES: "The Synthesis of (14)C-Labelled Diethylcarbamazine, 1-Diethylcarbamyl-4-methylpiperazine ("Hetrazan")", J. CHEM. SOC., 1953, pages 3874 - 3877, XP000943297
  • [Y] T. M. WILLIAMS ET AL.: "2-Substituted Piperazines as Constrained Amino Acids. Application to the Synthesis of Potent, Non Carboxylic Acid Inhibitors of Farnesyltransferase", J. MED. CHEM., vol. 39, no. 7, 1996, pages 1345 - 1348, XP002152726
  • See also references of WO 9736888A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9736888 A1 19971009; AU 2587597 A 19971022; AU 715667 B2 20000210; CA 2249604 A1 19971009; EP 0891349 A1 19990120; EP 0891349 A4 20010124; JP 2000507576 A 20000620

INPADOC legal status

2002-05-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011001

2001-01-24 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20001206

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1999-01-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981103

1999-01-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE