Global Patent Index - EP 0891458 B1

EP 0891458 B1 2001-01-10 - CONSTRUCTION, PANEL THEREFOR AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME

Title (en)

CONSTRUCTION, PANEL THEREFOR AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME

Title (de)

BAUSTRUKTUR, PANEL FÜR EINE SOLCHE BAUSTRUKTUR UND SEINE HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

STRUCTURE, PANNEAU POUR UNE TELLE STRUCTURE ET SA FABRICATION

Publication

EP 0891458 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97916276 A

Priority

  • BE 9700041 W
  • BE 9600290 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9738179A1] A modular construction essentially consisting of two vertical panels (100, 101) with mutually facing planar walls (2), and two horizontal panels (102, 103) arranged between the planar walls (2) of said vertical panels (100, 101) by means of bolts (106) inserted into tubes (23) in the vertical panels (100, 101) then screwed into sockets (20) in tie-rods (19) of the horizontal panels (102, 103).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/348; B28B 7/00; B28B 23/00; B28B 23/02; E04B 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 7/36 (2006.01); B28B 19/00 (2006.01); E04B 1/04 (2006.01); E04B 1/348 (2006.01); E04B 1/38 (2006.01); E04B 1/35 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/383 (2013.01); B28B 7/36 (2013.01); B28B 19/003 (2013.01); E04B 1/043 (2013.01); E04B 1/34823 (2013.01); E04B 2001/3583 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9738179 A1 19971016; BE 1010092 A6 19971202; DE 69703881 D1 20010215; EP 0891458 A1 19990120; EP 0891458 B1 20010110

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140430

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-12-27 [REG FR IC] DECISION OF THE DIRECTOR GENERAL TO DECLARE IRRECEIVABLE OR TO REJECT AN APPEAL

- Effective date: 20131126

2013-09-20 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

- Effective date: 20130819

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-01-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111230

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100507

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-04-30 [PGRI FR] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Effective date: 20091214

2009-04-30 [PGRI FR] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Effective date: 20040131

2009-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081231

2004-11-12 [REG FR FC] FAVOURABLE DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL ON AN APPLICATION FOR RESTAURATION.

2004-08-27 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

2004-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-01-30 [REG FR D3] DECISION TO REVOKE THE DECISION OF LAPSE

2004-01-23 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

2003-02-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-07-11 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-04-11 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703881 20010215

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2001-01-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-01-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-01-10 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010110

2000-01-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991123

1999-01-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981001

1999-01-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL