Global Patent Index - EP 0891485 B1

EP 0891485 B1 2000-08-16 - CARBURETOR WITH FUEL NOZZLE

Title (en)

CARBURETOR WITH FUEL NOZZLE

Title (de)

VERGASER BRENNSTOFFDÜSE

Title (fr)

CARBURATEUR A INJECTEUR DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 0891485 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97902962 A

Priority

  • US 9700684 W
  • US 62773796 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9737120A1] A carburetor including a carburetor body (22) having a throat (24) extending from an intake (26) to a discharge (28), and a fuel nozzle (32) positioned within the throat and including an upstream orifice facing substantially upstream and a downstream orifice facing substantially downstream. A surface area of the upstream orifice is smaller than a surface area of the downstream orifice. If more than one orifice is provided on each side, a combined surface area of all upstream orifices is less than a combined surface area of all downstream orifices. The upstream orifice is positioned closer to the carburetor body than any of the downstream orifices. The downstream orifice includes a plurality of downstream orifices that have an average position that is centered with respect to the throat.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 7/02 (2006.01); F02M 19/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 19/03 (2013.01); F02M 7/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9737120 A1 19971009; CA 2247866 A1 19971009; CA 2247866 C 20050329; DE 69702840 D1 20000921; DE 69702840 T2 20010125; EP 0891485 A1 19990120; EP 0891485 B1 20000816; JP H11506519 A 19990608

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140122

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69702840

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69702840

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130116

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120114

- Year of fee payment: 16

2001-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-01-12 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-09-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MARIETTI E GISLON S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69702840

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-21

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE IT

1999-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990226

1999-01-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980223

1999-01-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE IT