Global Patent Index - EP 0891728 A3

EP 0891728 A3 2000-04-26 - Armrest for benches

Title (en)

Armrest for benches

Title (de)

Rückenlehne für Bänke

Title (fr)

Dossier pour des bancs

Publication

EP 0891728 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98112256 A

Priority

DE 19731105 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0891728A2] The portable back part (16) for a bench (10) or a stool comprises a U-shaped metal frame (22, 24) and four traversal positioned plastic elements (25, 26, 28, 30). The frame (22, 24) has a clamping device (38) attached to each of its lower ends which comprises a rigid swivel mounted holding element (4) and a clamp (42) and is operated by an eccentric lever (44). A support element (18) can be attached to the stands of the bench/stool (10) to prevent the bench (10) or he stool from turning over.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 11/00; A47C 7/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/42 (2006.01); A47C 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 11/00 (2013.01); A47C 7/42 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0891728 A2 19990120; EP 0891728 A3 20000426; DE 19731105 A1 19990128; DE 19731105 C2 19991216

INPADOC legal status


2001-07-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001027

2001-02-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-01-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI