Global patent index - EP 0891730 A3

EP 0891730 A3 2000-04-19 - Slatted bed base with adjustable parts

Title (en)

Slatted bed base with adjustable parts

Title (de)

Bettlattenrost mit gegeneinander verstellbaren Rostteilen

Title (fr)

Sommier à lattes avec parties réglables

Publication

EP 0891730 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98101670 A

Priority

DE 19730474 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0891730A2] The bed base has a frame divided into two upper parts (1, 2) and two lower parts (3, 4) which are movably joined and can be adjusted either manually or with an electric drive. When the upper part (2) is moved into a vertical position a bolt (9) slides in a semicircular guide (11) to facilitate the adjustment of the seating position without reduction of the overall length of the frame.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 20/04; A47C 20/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 20/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 20/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0891730 A2 19990120; EP 0891730 A3 20000419; EP 0891730 B1 20021218

INPADOC legal status

2006-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2005-02-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050221

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59806685

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-01-30

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59806685

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-01-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000606

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE

1999-01-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI