Global patent index - EP 0891820 A3

EP 0891820 A3 2000-01-12 - Pneumatic separator

Title (en)

Pneumatic separator

Title (de)

Windsichter

Title (fr)

Séparateur pneumatique

Publication

EP 0891820 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98113124 A

Priority

DE 19730371 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0891820A2] The wind sifter, in particular, in the form of a cascade wind sifter, has an inner element (2) whose longitudinal contour is shaped in a zig-zag fashion, and an outer element (1) whose longitudinal contour substantially runs parallel to the corresponding contour of the rotationally symmetric inner element. The product path leads from top to bottom, and is shaped so that no so-called dead spaces are created.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07B 4/04; B07B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07B 4/04 (2006.01); B07B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07B 11/00 (2013.01); B07B 4/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0891820 A2 19990120; EP 0891820 A3 20000112

INPADOC legal status

2002-07-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011227

2001-09-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010813

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000321

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-01-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI