Global Patent Index - EP 0891909 B1

EP 0891909 B1 2002-12-18 - Streamlined two level driving cab vehicle

Title (en)

Streamlined two level driving cab vehicle

Title (de)

Stromlinienförmiger Doppelstock-Steuerwagen

Title (fr)

Voiture - pilote carénée à deux niveaux

Publication

EP 0891909 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98111173 A

Priority

DE 19731120 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0891909A1] The control or drive carriage has a closable driver cabin (11), and a passenger compartment (7). The driver cabin is arranged centrally to the longitudinal axis of the train, and at floor height, to lie between the height specified by the structural height of the chassis and the floor height of the top storey. The space (21) under the driver cabin is provided for the installation of engineering units. The driver cabin is accessible over a second side gangway, which is arranged lying opposite to a side gangway, leading to the forward passenger compartment (7). Steps are provided between the second side gangway and the driver cabin.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 1/06; B61C 17/04; B61D 17/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61C 17/04 (2006.01); B61D 1/06 (2006.01); B61D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61C 17/04 (2013.01); B61D 1/06 (2013.01); B61D 17/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0891909 A1 19990120; EP 0891909 B1 20021218; AT 229902 T 20030115; DE 19731120 A1 19990121

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130701

2014-05-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130618

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130618

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-03-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-03-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806688

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 229902 T

- Effective date: 20130618

2014-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120613

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120628

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120705

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: TALBOT GMBH & CO. KG

- Free text: TALBOT GMBH & CO. KG#JUELICHER STRASSE 213-237#52070 AACHEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- TALBOT GMBH & CO. KG#JUELICHER STRASSE 213-237#52070 AACHEN (DE)

2003-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-07-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806688 20030130

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806688 P 20030130

2002-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2002-12-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 229902 T 20030115

2002-10-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TALBOT GMBH & CO. KG

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020619

1999-09-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

1999-01-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981120

1999-01-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

1999-01-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI