Global Patent Index - EP 0892030 B1

EP 0892030 B1 2002-09-11 - Apparatus for the distillative separation of crude oil

Title (en)

Apparatus for the distillative separation of crude oil

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur kontinuierlichen destillativen Auftrennung von Rohöl

Title (fr)

Installation pour la séparation destillative d'huile brute

Publication

EP 0892030 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98890204 A

Priority

AT 122997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0892030A2] The apparatus is used for the fractionation of crude oil fed (L2) to furnaces (1, 2), connected (L3) directly or indirectly to the vaporisation section of a distillation column with bubble-cap trays. Side strippers are connected to different trays and/or a superheater. A head cooler is included. A gas turbine- (GT) generator (G) set in included, having a waste gas heat exchanger (W1), from which the crude is directly and/or indirectly heated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10G 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10G 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 7/00 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

  • EP 0569796 A2 19931118 - KELLOGG M W CO [US]
  • KIRK-OTHMER: "Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology Bd. 20, S. 23-24", 1996, JOHN WILEY & SONS, NEW YORK

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GR IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0892030 A2 19990120; EP 0892030 A3 19990728; EP 0892030 B1 20020911; AT 406165 B 20000327; AT A122997 A 19990715; BG 102642 A 19990226; BG 63400 B1 20011231; DE 59805483 D1 20021017; ES 2181156 T3 20030216; HR P980400 A2 19991031; HR P980400 B1 20010831; PT 892030 E 20030131; SK 283465 B6 20030805; SK 97398 A3 19990211

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20180201

2018-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805483

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160728

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59805483

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE KEILITZ & PARTNER, PARTNERSCHAF, DE

2013-12-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59805483

- Representative's name: KEILITZ & SOELLNER, PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2013-12-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59805483

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE KEILITZ & PARTNER, PARTNERSCHAF, DE

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090714

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090715

2010-09-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090715

2010-04-30 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-04-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100114

2010-01-26 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20100114

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080707

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080708

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20080702

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *OMV REFINING & MARKETING G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20050731

2006-05-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-04-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060201

2006-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-02-02 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060202

2006-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-09-30 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2005-09-30 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2005-09-30 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-06-30 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Free text: OMV REFINING & MARKETING AG AT

- Effective date: 20050414

2005-06-30 [REG PT PD4A] CHANGE OF PROPRIETORSHIP

- Free text: OMV REFINING & MARKETING GMBH AT

- Effective date: 20050414

2005-04-30 [REG SI SP73] CHANGE OF DATA ON OWNER

- Owner name: OMV REFINING & MARKETING GMBH; AT

- Effective date: 20050322

2005-04-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: OMV REFINING & MARKETING GMBH

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2004-07-13 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040713

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040630

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040624

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-18 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20040618

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-04-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2181156 T3

2003-02-04 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020404246

2003-01-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805483 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GR IT NL PT

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20000117;SI PAYMENT 20000117

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010322

2000-04-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GR IT NL PT

2000-04-05 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20000117;SI PAYMENT 20000117

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000117

1999-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-07-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GR IT NL PT

1999-01-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI