Global Patent Index - EP 0892073 B1

EP 0892073 B1 2002-09-11 - Funnel-shaped mould with a liner tube for the electroslag remelting as well a process therefor

Title (en)

Funnel-shaped mould with a liner tube for the electroslag remelting as well a process therefor

Title (de)

Trichterkokille mit trichterförmigem Einsatzrohr für das Elektroschlackeumschmelzen sowie Verfahren dazu

Title (fr)

Lingotiére en forme d'entonnoir avec un tube de revêtement pour la refusion sous laitier électroconducteur ainsi qu' un procédé associé

Publication

EP 0892073 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98110287 A

Priority

DE 19728098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0892073A1] The funnel mould (10) with a funnel insert (12) and a melting electrode (58) has a surrounding cutout (36) which is located in the top region of the insert (12) for an approximately ring-shaped graphite electrode (40). This electrode is insulated from the insert by an element (38). The graphite electrode is located below the slag surface level and is surrounded from above by a contact ring (42) with a limiting annular gap (50). The contact ring is connected to the supply grid (54) by a high-current cable (52). The pressure of the cooling water in the gap (22) produces a force to press the graphite electrode (40) against the contact ring (42).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22B 9/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/04 (2006.01); B22D 23/10 (2006.01); C22B 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22B 9/18 (2013.01); B22D 11/0401 (2013.01); B22D 23/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19728098 A1 19990107; AT 223974 T 20020915; EP 0892073 A1 19990120; EP 0892073 B1 20020911

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130701

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130605

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130605

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-04-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805484

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-03-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-02-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130605

2014-02-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130606

2014-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *INTECO INTERNATIONALE TECHNISCHE BERATUNG G.M.B.H

- Effective date: 20130630

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120718

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-10-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120627

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120620

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120704

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120626

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120627

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120626

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-01-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: INTECO INTERNATIONALE TECHNISCHE BERATUNG GESELLS

- Free text: INTECO INTERNATIONALE TECHNISCHE BERATUNG GESELLSCHAFT MBH#WIENER STRASSE 25#A-8600 BRUCK A.D. MUR (AT) -TRANSFER TO- INTECO INTERNATIONALE TECHNISCHE BERATUNG GESELLSCHAFT MBH#WIENER STRASSE 25#A-8600 BRUCK A.D. MUR (AT)

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-06-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-04-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030306

2003-03-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HIEBSCH & PEEGE AG PATENTANWAELTE

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805484 20021017

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223974 T 20020915

2001-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011011

1999-09-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1999-05-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990311

1999-01-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1999-01-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI