Global Patent Index - EP 0892087 A3

EP 0892087 A3 2000-06-07 - Electroplating of low-stress nickel

Title (en)

Electroplating of low-stress nickel

Title (de)

Elektrobeschichtung von spannungsarmem Nickel

Title (fr)

Electroplacage de nickel à faibles contraintes

Publication

EP 0892087 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98304642 A

Priority

  • US 5014097 P
  • US 6492398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0892087A2] Nickel and nickel alloys can be electroplated from an aqueous acidic solution containing nickel alkane sulfonic acid and a stress-reducing additive that imparts compressive stress to an electrodeposit. The electroplating bath is acidic with a pH of 0 to 5.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25D 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25D 3/12 (2006.01); C25D 21/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25D 3/12 (2013.01); C25D 21/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 3312604 A 19670404 - HERBERT WELLS FREDERICK, et al
  • [A] GB 1213267 A 19701125 - NICKEL LE [FR]
  • [A] US 4108740 A 19780822 - WEARMOUTH WILLIAM RONALD
  • [A] US 3726768 A 19730410 - LUNDQUIST J, et al
  • [DX] KUDRYAVTSEV ET AL.: "Nickel Electrodeposition from Methansulfonic Acid-Based Bath", PROCEEDINGS OF AMERICAN ELECTROPLATERS, SURFACE FINISHING, 1996, pages 837 - 841, XP000884995
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 446 (C - 1098) 17 August 1993 (1993-08-17)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 06 28 June 1996 (1996-06-28)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 379 (C - 628) 22 August 1989 (1989-08-22)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0892087 A2 19990120; EP 0892087 A3 20000607; CA 2236933 A1 19981218; CN 1142327 C 20040317; CN 1213019 A 19990407; JP H1171695 A 19990316; SG 63851 A1 19990330

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011023

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010410

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001112

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

1999-01-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI